+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- To Government Process Subcommittee
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 15, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 30 ILCS 105/5.891 new -
- 30 ILCS 105/6z-65.1 new -
- 30 ILCS 605/7.1 - from Ch. 127, par. 133b10.1
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor