+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- To Pension Reform Subcommittee
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mark Batinick
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- 40 ILCS 5/3-103 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 3-103
- 40 ILCS 5/3-145 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 3-145
- 40 ILCS 5/4-103 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 4-103
- 40 ILCS 5/4-141 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 4-141
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor