+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 9, 2007 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 18, 2005 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 16, 2005 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Reis
On March 10, 2005 in the House:
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) March 17, 2005
On March 1, 2005 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On February 24, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 23, 2005 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Chapin Rose
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor