+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 9, 2012 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On January 30, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On March 17, 2011 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 1, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Luis Arroyo
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 625 ILCS 5/3-600 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 3-600
- 625 ILCS 5/3-696 new -
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor