+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 4, 2022 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On February 10, 2022 in the House:
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 005-003-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Agriculture & Conservation Committee; by Voice Vote
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper
On January 5, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
On March 27, 2021 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Makes changes to the provisions creating the Black Farmer Restoration Fund. Makes a corresponding change in the State Finance Act. Corrects typographical and formatting errors.
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Vote
February 10, 2022: HB3501 - Agriculture & Conservation
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor