+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On July 26, 2019 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0122
- Effective Date July 26, 2019
- Governor Approved
On June 19, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 046-005-000
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2019
- Second Reading
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2019
- Do Pass Higher Education; 010-000-000
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Higher Education
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Higher Education
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 070-042-000
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed
- Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 016-000-000
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Higher Education Committee
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On November 30, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
+ − Votes (4)
May 21, 2019: HB0035 - Third Reading
May 7, 2019: HB0035 - Higher Education
March 19, 2019: HB0035 - Third Reading
February 6, 2019: HB0035 - Higher Education
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor