+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 29, 2007 in the House:
- Tabled By Sponsor Rep. William B. Black
- Motion Prevailed
On March 23, 2007 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 7, 2007 in the House:
- Motion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b) Rep. William B. Black
On March 1, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Drivers Education & Safety Committee
On February 28, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 27, 2007 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William B. Black
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor