+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (44)
On August 9, 2019 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0285
- Effective Date January 1, 2020
- Governor Approved
On June 28, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 30, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
- House Concurs
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 116-000-000
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
On May 20, 2019 in the House:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Natalie A. Manley
On May 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
On May 17, 2019 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019
- Second Reading
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 16, 2019
- Do Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 009-000-000
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Waive Posting Notice
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Re-assigned to Criminal Law
- Re-assigned to Criminal Law
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 17, 2019
On May 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 To Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance
On May 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- To Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Criminal Law
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 9, 2019
- Arrive in Senate
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 019-000-000
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Amendment 001
Provides that when a parent, guardian, or other person having physical custody or control of a child who knowingly facilitates or permits the circumcision, excision, or infibulation, in whole or in part, of the labia majora, labia minora, or clitoris of the child commits a Class 1 felony (rather than a Class X felony).
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 720 ILCS 5/3-6 - from Ch. 38, par. 3-6
- 720 ILCS 5/12-34 -
+ − Votes (6)
May 30, 2019: SCA0001 - Concurrence
May 17, 2019: HB3498 - Third Reading
May 14, 2019: HB3498 - Criminal Law
May 14, 2019: SCA0001 - Criminal Law
April 4, 2019: HB3498 - Third Reading
March 26, 2019: HB3498 - Judiciary - Criminal
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor