+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. John Connor
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 028-000-000
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John Connor
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
March 20, 2019: HB3497 - Labor & Commerce
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor