+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (51)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0257
- Effective Date August 4, 2015
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- House Concurs
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 110-000-001
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2
- Arrived in House
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 29, 2015
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Muñoz
- Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 017-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 18, 2015
- Do Pass Commerce and Economic Development; 011-000-000
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Emil Jones, III
- Postponed - Commerce and Economic Development
- Sponsor Removed Sen. William R. Haine
- Assigned to Commerce and Economic Development
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 095-019-001
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 012-002-000
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
Senate Amendment 002
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the contents of the engrossed bill with the following changes: sets forth provisions concerning a single prime project operative through December 31, 2019; provides that for building construction projects with a total construction cost valued at $5,000,000 or less, the Capital Development Board shall not use the single prime procurement delivery method for more than 50% of the total number of projects bid for each fiscal year; provides that for every fifth determination to use the single prime procurement delivery method for a project under $10,000,000, the Capital Development Board shall submit to the Procurement Policy Board a written notice of its intent to use the single prime method on the project; provides that on and after January 1, 2020, separate specifications shall be prepared for all equipment, labor, and materials for building construction contracts in excess of $250,000; sets forth provisions concerning the 5 subdivisions of work to be performed under building construction contracts in excess of $250,000. Adds a definition of "single prime".
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the contents of the introduced bill with the following change: repeals the Act on December 31, 2020. Effective immediately.