+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On August 18, 2017 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0183
- Effective Date August 18, 2017
- Governor Approved
On June 23, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 25, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2017
- Second Reading
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2017
- Do Pass Higher Education; 007-000-000
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Higher Education
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
On April 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 28, 2017
- Arrive in Senate
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-000
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 019-000-000
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to Higher Education Committee
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Dan Brady
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
+ − Statute Amended
- 110 ILCS 975/3 - from Ch. 144, par. 2753