+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 7, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On March 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 21, 2003
- Arrive in Senate
On March 19, 2003 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
On March 18, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 6, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 011-000-000
On January 30, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On January 29, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 27, 2003 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ron Stephens
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -
+ − Vote
March 19, 2003: HB0349 - Third Reading - Wednesday, March 19, 2003
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor