+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On July 22, 2019 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0117
- Effective Date January 1, 2020
- Governor Approved
On June 14, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 17, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2019
- Second Reading
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 14, 2019
- Do Pass Insurance; 018-000-000
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Insurance
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 4, 2019
- Arrive in Senate
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 098-005-001
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 022-000-000
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Insurance Committee
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (4)
May 17, 2019: HB3487 - Third Reading
May 8, 2019: HB3487 - Insurance
April 2, 2019: HB3487 - Third Reading
March 19, 2019: HB3487 - Insurance
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor