+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 009-005-000
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 410 ILCS 50/3 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 5403