+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 17, 2011 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
On March 7, 2011 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Counties & Townships Committee
On March 4, 2011 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Joe Sosnowski
On March 1, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Joe Sosnowski
+ − Adopted Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (8)
- 35 ILCS 200/3-40 -
- 55 ILCS 5/3-10007 - from Ch. 34, par. 3-10007
- 55 ILCS 5/4-6001 - from Ch. 34, par. 4-6001
- 55 ILCS 5/4-6002 - from Ch. 34, par. 4-6002
- 55 ILCS 5/4-6003 - from Ch. 34, par. 4-6003
- 55 ILCS 5/4-8002 - from Ch. 34, par. 4-8002
- 705 ILCS 105/27.3 - from Ch. 25, par. 27.3
- 30 ILCS 805/8.35 new -
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor