+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On August 12, 2011 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0350
- Effective Date January 1, 2012
- Governor Approved
On June 15, 2011 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 17, 2011 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
On May 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 13, 2011
- Second Reading
On May 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 11, 2011
- Do Pass Judiciary; 008-000-000
On April 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On April 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
On April 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
On April 1, 2011 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-000
On March 17, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 15, 2011 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
On March 10, 2011 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sidney H. Mathias
On March 9, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee; 011-000-000
On March 1, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sidney H. Mathias
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Floor Amendment No. 1
Further amends the Code of Civil Procedure. Provides that a foreign judgment filed or registered under the Act shall be construed to be an original Illinois judgment (instead of shall be an original Illinois judgment) from the date it is filed with the clerk. Deletes changes to the Probate Act of 1975. Makes other changes.
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
- 735 ILCS 5/2-1402 - from Ch. 110, par. 2-1402
- 735 ILCS 5/2-1602 -
- 735 ILCS 5/12-101 - from Ch. 110, par. 12-101
- 735 ILCS 5/12-112.5 new -
- 735 ILCS 5/12-652 - from Ch. 110, par. 12-652
- 755 ILCS 5/18-12 - from Ch. 110 1/2, par. 18-12
+ − Votes (2)
May 17, 2011: HB3478 - Third Reading - Tuesday, May 17, 2011
April 1, 2011: HB3478 - Third Reading - Friday, April 01, 2011
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor