+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On June 30, 2014 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to Appropriations-Public Safety Committee
On August 9, 2013 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to Appropriations-Public Safety Committee
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor