+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 24, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On March 21, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 24, 2003
- Arrive in Senate
On March 20, 2003 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
On March 18, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 13, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 012-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On March 5, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On February 28, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Joe Dunn
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Eliminates probation for criminal sexual assault and aggravated criminal sexual abuse. Restores provisions of the offenses of criminal sexual assault and aggravated criminal sexual abuse relating to an offender who is in a position of trust, authority, or supervision in relation to a victim who is at least 13 years of age but under 18 years of age when the offense was committed.
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
- 720 ILCS 5/12-12 - from Ch. 38, par. 12-12
- 720 ILCS 5/12-13 - from Ch. 38, par. 12-13
- 720 ILCS 5/12-16 - from Ch. 38, par. 12-16
- 730 ILCS 5/5-5-3 - from Ch. 38, par. 1005-5-3
- 730 ILCS 5/5-9-1.7 - from Ch. 38, par. 1005-9-1.7
+ − Vote
March 20, 2003: HB3466 - Third Reading - Thursday, March 20, 2003
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor