+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (33)
On August 18, 2017 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0181
- Effective Date August 18, 2017
- Governor Approved
On June 23, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 25, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2017
- Second Reading
On May 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2017
- Do Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 013-000-000
On May 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading May 3, 2017
- Arrive in Senate
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-001
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 009-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; by Voice Vote
- Reported Back To Business & Occupational Licenses Committee;
- Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 003-000-000
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- To Business Licenses Subcommittee
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (5)
May 25, 2017: HB3464 - Third Reading
May 11, 2017: HB3464 - Licensed Activities and Pensions
April 28, 2017: HB3464 - Third Reading
March 29, 2017: HB3464 - Business Licenses Subcommittee
March 29, 2017: HB3464 - Business & Occupational Licenses
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor