+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (34)
On July 26, 2019 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0152
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date July 26, 2019
On June 14, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 17, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 051-001-000
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2019
- Second Reading
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2019
- Do Pass Education; 010-002-000
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Education
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 018-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Monica Bristow
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Monica Bristow
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 018-000-000
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Monica Bristow
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Amendment 002
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the School Code. Provides that a school district may offer its students a course on hunting safety as part of its curriculum during the school day or as part of an after-school program. Provides that the State Board of Education may prepare and make available to school boards resources on hunting safety that may be used as guidelines for the development of the course. Effective July 1, 2019.
+ − Proposed Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (5)
May 17, 2019: HB3462 - Third Reading
May 7, 2019: HB3462 - Education
April 11, 2019: HB3462 - Third Reading
April 9, 2019: HFA0002 - Elem Sec Ed: School Curric Policies
March 20, 2019: HB3462 - Elem Sec Ed: School Curric Policies
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor