+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 13, 2004 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Deadline Extended - Rule 2-10, extended to January 11, 2005.
On July 1, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Rules
On May 16, 2003 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Deadline Extended - Rule 2-10, to December 31, 2003.
On May 8, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2003
- Second Reading
On May 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Requested by Sen. Dale A. Righter
On May 1, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 6, 2003
- Do Pass Health & Human Services; 006-000-003
On April 29, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Barack Obama
On April 10, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Health & Human Services
On April 2, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On March 26, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 27, 2003
- Arrive in Senate
On March 25, 2003 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 087-004-022
On March 21, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 12, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Developmental Disabilities and Mental Illness Committee; 008-000-000
On March 5, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Developmental Disabilities and Mental Illness Committee
On February 28, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Karen A. Yarbrough
+ − Adopted Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 20 ILCS 2405/3 - from Ch. 23, par. 3434
+ − Vote
March 25, 2003: HB3455 - Third Reading - Tuesday, March 25, 2003
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor