+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (66)
On December 28, 2018 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On November 29, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
- House Concurs
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 House Concurs 108-000-000
- 3/5 Vote Required
On November 28, 2018 in the House:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 019-000-000
On November 26, 2018 in the House:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Labor & Commerce Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Jay Hoffman
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jay Hoffman
On November 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 010-000-000
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Michael E. Hastings
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Withdrawn by Sen. John J. Cullerton
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Withdrawn by Sen. Daniel Biss
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Hastings
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- 3/5 Vote Required
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
On November 14, 2018 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 3
On November 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
On November 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading November 13, 2018
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
On May 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton
On December 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On November 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Daniel Biss
On November 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Daniel Biss
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 011-002-000
On November 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading November 8, 2017
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
On August 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2017
- Second Reading
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2017
- Do Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 010-000-000
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
- First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
- Referred to Assignments
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-003-000
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 015-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Health Care Licenses Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Cynthia Soto
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Cynthia Soto
+ − Proposed Amendments (3)
+ − Statutes Amended (21)
- 5 ILCS 80/4.28 -
- 5 ILCS 80/4.38 new -
- 225 ILCS 100/3 - from Ch. 111, par. 4803
- 225 ILCS 100/5 - from Ch. 111, par. 4805
- 225 ILCS 100/5.5 new -
- 225 ILCS 100/7 - from Ch. 111, par. 4807
- 225 ILCS 100/12 - from Ch. 111, par. 4812
- 225 ILCS 100/14 - from Ch. 111, par. 4814
- 225 ILCS 100/15 - from Ch. 111, par. 4815
- 225 ILCS 100/19 - from Ch. 111, par. 4819
- 225 ILCS 100/24 - from Ch. 111, par. 4824
- 225 ILCS 100/26 - from Ch. 111, par. 4826
- 225 ILCS 100/27 - from Ch. 111, par. 4827
- 225 ILCS 100/34 - from Ch. 111, par. 4834
- 225 ILCS 100/36 - from Ch. 111, par. 4836
- 225 ILCS 100/40 - from Ch. 111, par. 4840
- 225 ILCS 100/42 - from Ch. 111, par. 4842
- 225 ILCS 100/46 new -
- 225 ILCS 100/20 rep. -
- 225 ILCS 100/39 rep. -
- 820 ILCS 305/8.2 -