+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 23, 2021 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Public Utilities Committee; 024-000-000
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Public Utilities Committee
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.