+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On November 8, 2011 in the House:
- Bill Dead - No Positive Action Taken - Amendatory Veto
On October 24, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto October 25, 2011
On August 26, 2011 in the House:
- Governor Amendatory Veto
On June 29, 2011 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 31, 2011 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 115-000-000
On May 29, 2011 in the House:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
On May 26, 2011 in the House:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
- Arrived in House
On May 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-002-000
On May 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 20, 2011
- Second Reading
On May 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Emil Jones, III
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Do Pass as Amended Education; 009-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 11, 2011
On May 5, 2011 in the Senate:
- Held in Education
On April 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Education
On April 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
On April 5, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 16, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 024-000-000
On March 1, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Provides that reasonable accommodations must be sought for the use of service animals to accompany a student with a disability at all school functions (instead of providing that service animals shall be permitted to accompany the student at all school functions). Makes a technical correction.
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- 105 ILCS 5/14-6.02 - from Ch. 122, par. 14-6.02
- 720 ILCS 630/Act title -
- 720 ILCS 630/0.01 - from Ch. 38, par. 65
- 720 ILCS 630/1 - from Ch. 38, par. 65-1
+ − Votes (3)
May 31, 2011: SCA0001 - Concurrence - Tuesday, May 31, 2011
May 25, 2011: HB3440 - Third Reading - Wednesday, May 25, 2011
April 6, 2011: HB3440 - Third Reading - Wednesday, April 06, 2011
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor