+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On January 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Labor
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 070-042-000
On April 17, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Ed Sullivan
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Ed Sullivan
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 014-006-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Labor & Commerce Committee; by Voice Vote
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mike Smiddy
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mike Smiddy
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the contents of the original bill. Effective January 1, 2016.
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (3)
April 22, 2015: HB3438 - Third Reading - Wednesday, April 22, 2015
March 25, 2015: HB3438 - Labor & Commerce Committee - Mar 25, 2015
March 25, 2015: HCA0001 - Labor & Commerce Committee - Mar 25, 2015
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor