+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 8, 2019 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- To Property Tax Subcommittee
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
On January 11, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney
+ − Statute Amended
- 65 ILCS 5/11-74.4-7 - from Ch. 24, par. 11-74.4-7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor