+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On June 30, 2014 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
On August 9, 2013 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-004-000
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Re-assigned to Executive Committee
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor