+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (39)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On April 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
On April 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 8, 2022
On November 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On October 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b)(ii) this bill shall not be re-referred to the Committee on Assignment pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b).
On August 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading August 31, 2021
On August 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As December 1, 2021
On July 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On June 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On May 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As June 15, 2021
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 29, 2021
On May 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 27, 2021
On May 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
On May 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John Connor
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John Connor
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Removed from Short Debate Status
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
- Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 114-000-000
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 023-002-000
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jonathan Carroll
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
April 15, 2021: HB3418 - Third Reading
March 24, 2021: HB3418 - Labor & Commerce
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor