+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (33)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On July 1, 2008 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Rules
On May 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 14, 2008
- Do Pass Judiciary Criminal Law; 008-000-001
On May 7, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary Criminal Law
On March 19, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On May 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading May 3, 2007
- Arrive in Senate
On May 2, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 087-023-002
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
- Removed from Short Debate Status
On May 1, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
On April 30, 2007 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
On April 27, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 3, 2007
On April 26, 2007 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 25, 2007 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Ruth Munson
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 20, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 22, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 008-004-001
- Remains in Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
- Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 003-002-000
On March 20, 2007 in the House:
- Motion to Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed
On March 1, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On February 27, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ruth Munson
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Floor Amendment No. 1
Exempts Class 1 felonies from the enhanced penalties.