+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (37)
On September 11, 2007 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0598
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date June 1, 2008
On July 13, 2007 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On June 14, 2007 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 099-000-000
On June 8, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 15, 2007
On May 31, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 8, 2007
On May 28, 2007 in the House:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
On May 25, 2007 in the House:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Renée Kosel
On May 18, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
- Arrived in House
On May 18, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 049-005-000
On May 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Do Pass as Amended Transportation; 009-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 16, 2007
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2007
On May 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation
On May 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. A. J. Wilhelmi
On May 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Transportation
On April 25, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Transportation
On March 29, 2007 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 30, 2007
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules
On March 28, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
On March 27, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 15, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 14, 2007 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Registration and Regulation Committee; 017-000-000
On March 1, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Registration and Regulation Committee
On February 27, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Renée Kosel
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Provides that the taxicab medallion number or an exterior identification number must be posted in a visible location in each cab. Deletes language providing that law enforcement officers must respond to stop any taxicab if a passenger calls from inside that taxicab.
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -
+ − Votes (3)
June 14, 2007: SCA0001 - Concurrence - Thursday, June 14, 2007
May 18, 2007: HB3412 - Third Reading - Friday, May 18, 2007
March 28, 2007: HB3412 - Third Reading - Wednesday, March 28, 2007
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor