+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On July 1, 2008 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Rules
On May 22, 2008 in the Senate:
- Held in Education
On May 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2008; Substantive House Bills Out of Committee
- Postponed - Education
On May 1, 2008 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Education
On April 17, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Education
On August 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On April 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 24, 2007
- Arrive in Senate
On April 17, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
On April 11, 2007 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Brent Hassert
On March 27, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 15, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 14, 2007 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 022-000-000
On March 1, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
On February 27, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Renée Kosel
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brent Hassert
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Cross
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
April 17, 2007: HB3406 - Third Reading - Tuesday, April 17, 2007
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor