+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- To Property Tax Subcommittee
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Karina Villa
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor