+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On August 7, 2019 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0217
- Effective Date January 1, 2020
- Governor Approved
On June 14, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 17, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2019
- Second Reading
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019
- Do Pass Higher Education; 013-000-000
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Higher Education
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 4, 2019
- Arrive in Senate
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 020-000-000
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Higher Education Committee
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Karina Villa
+ − Statutes Amended (10)
+ − Votes (4)
May 17, 2019: HB3404 - Third Reading
May 1, 2019: HB3404 - Higher Education
April 2, 2019: HB3404 - Third Reading
March 20, 2019: HB3404 - Higher Education
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor