+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Joyce Mason
+ − Statutes Amended (10)
- 325 ILCS 5/4 -
- 720 ILCS 5/14-3 -
- 735 ILCS 5/8-803 - from Ch. 110, par. 8-803
- 750 ILCS 60/102 - from Ch. 40, par. 2311-2
- 750 ILCS 60/103 - from Ch. 40, par. 2311-3
- 750 ILCS 60/212.5 new -
- 750 ILCS 60/213.4 new -
- 750 ILCS 60/214 - from Ch. 40, par. 2312-14
- 750 ILCS 60/302 - from Ch. 40, par. 2313-2
- 750 ILCS 60/302.5 new -