+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 13, 2003 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On January 30, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On January 29, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 27, 2003 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay C. Hoffman
+ − Statutes Amended (8)
- 55 ILCS 5/5-1022 - from Ch. 34, par. 5-1022
- 70 ILCS 210/24 - from Ch. 85, par. 1244
- 70 ILCS 1205/8-1 - from Ch. 105, par. 8-1
- 70 ILCS 2305/11 - from Ch. 42, par. 287
- 70 ILCS 2405/11 - from Ch. 42, par. 310
- 70 ILCS 3615/4.06 - from Ch. 111 2/3, par. 704.06
- 105 ILCS 5/10-20.21 - from Ch. 122, par. 10-20.21
- 110 ILCS 805/3-27.1 - from Ch. 122, par. 103-27.1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor