+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- To Property Tax Subcommittee
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On November 30, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor