+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (41)
On July 23, 2021 in the House:
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date January 1, 2022
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0108
On June 25, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 29, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2021
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Do Pass Revenue; 011-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 14, 2021
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Revenue
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 27, 2021
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-001
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Removed from Consent Calendar Status Rep. Avery Bourne
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading - Consent Calendar
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 006-000-000
- Reported Back To Revenue & Finance Committee;
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote
- Do Pass as Amended / Consent Calendar Revenue & Finance Committee; 018-000-000
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mark L. Walker
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mark L. Walker
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- To Sales, Amusement, & Other Taxes Subcommittee
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mark L. Walker
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Amendment 002
In the bill as amended by House Amendment No. 1, deletes a provision related to applicants that are located entirely within a county with a population of less than 300,000.
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with additions. Adds requirements concerning provisional certification and decertification of enterprise zones. Provides for the suspension of the benefits to specific businesses rather than an outright decertification of the particular Enterprise Zone for failure to submit specified information. Modifies the criteria for determining Enterprise Zones and underserved areas under the Act. Modifies reporting requirements under the Act. Makes conforming and other changes.
+ − Proposed Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (11)
- 20 ILCS 655/3 - from Ch. 67 1/2, par. 603
- 20 ILCS 655/4 - from Ch. 67 1/2, par. 604
- 20 ILCS 655/4.1
- 20 ILCS 655/5.1 - from Ch. 67 1/2, par. 606
- 20 ILCS 655/5.2 - from Ch. 67 1/2, par. 607
- 20 ILCS 655/5.3 - from Ch. 67 1/2, par. 608
- 20 ILCS 655/5.4 - from Ch. 67 1/2, par. 609
- 20 ILCS 655/8.1
- 20 ILCS 655/5.5 - from Ch. 67 1/2, par. 609.1
- 20 ILCS 655/12-9 - from Ch. 67 1/2, par. 626
- 20 ILCS 655/13