+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On August 14, 2008 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0819
- Effective Date January 1, 2009
- Governor Approved
On June 18, 2008 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 20, 2008 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 20, 2008 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
On May 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2008
- Second Reading
On May 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 13, 2008
- Do Pass Judiciary Criminal Law; 008-000-000
On April 17, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary Criminal Law
On May 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On April 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 24, 2007
- Arrive in Senate
On April 17, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 111-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
- Removed from Short Debate Status
On March 27, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 22, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 011-001-000
On March 1, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On February 26, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael K. Smith
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (2)
May 20, 2008: HB3399 - Third Reading - Tuesday, May 20, 2008
April 17, 2007: HB3399 - Third Reading - Tuesday, April 17, 2007
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor