+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On August 14, 2007 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0170
- Effective Date January 1, 2008
- Governor Approved
On June 15, 2007 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 18, 2007 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 18, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 053-001-000
On May 3, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 8, 2007
- Second Reading
On April 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 1, 2007
- Do Pass Commerce and Economic Development; 007-000-000
On March 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Commerce and Economic Development
On March 27, 2007 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules
On March 22, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 099-005-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
On March 13, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 8, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 7, 2007 in the House:
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Environment & Energy Committee; 023-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Environment & Energy Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Environment & Energy Committee
On March 1, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Environment & Energy Committee
On February 26, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Provides that the Department shall make grants to municipalities whose buildings conform with nationally recognized and accepted green building guidelines, standards, or systems (instead of the LEED rating system).
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (2)
May 18, 2007: HB3394 - Third Reading - Friday, May 18, 2007
March 22, 2007: HB3394 - Third Reading - Thursday, March 22, 2007
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor