+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 11, 2011 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 13, 2009 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 5, 2009 in the House:
- Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed
- Moved to Suspend Rule 25 Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
On February 4, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned to Consumer Protection Committee
On January 27, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 26, 2009 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Rosemary Mulligan
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor