+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (44)
On August 25, 2015 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0459
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date August 25, 2015
On August 7, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On July 9, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
- House Concurs
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 112-000-000
On June 30, 2015 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) July 31, 2015
On June 22, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-001-000
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2015
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000
On June 2, 2015 in the House:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Avery Bourne
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Avery Bourne
On May 31, 2015 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
- Arrived in House
On May 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000
On May 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 19, 2015
- Second Reading
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 18, 2015
- Do Pass as Amended State Government and Veterans Affairs; 005-000-000
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government and Veterans Affairs
On May 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Postponed - State Government and Veterans Affairs
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 21, 2015
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 007-000-000
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Mark Batinick
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the provisions of the engrossed bill with the following changes: Restores the option to file various documents that are submitted to the Comptroller as soon thereafter as various audits become available. Effective immediately.
+ − Statutes Amended (11)
- 50 ILCS 310/2 - from Ch. 85, par. 702
- 50 ILCS 310/4 - from Ch. 85, par. 704
- 55 ILCS 5/6-31003 - from Ch. 34, par. 6-31003
- 55 ILCS 5/6-31004 - from Ch. 34, par. 6-31004
- 55 ILCS 5/6-31005 - from Ch. 34, par. 6-31005
- 65 ILCS 5/8-8-3 - from Ch. 24, par. 8-8-3
- 65 ILCS 5/8-8-3.5 -
- 65 ILCS 5/8-8-4 - from Ch. 24, par. 8-8-4
- 65 ILCS 5/11-74.4-5 - from Ch. 24, par. 11-74.4-5
- 65 ILCS 5/11-74.6-22 -
- 65 ILCS 5/11-74.4-5 -