+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On August 18, 2017 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0174
- Effective Date January 1, 2018
- Governor Approved
On June 23, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 25, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 25, 2017
- Second Reading
On May 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 17, 2017
- Do Pass Education; 010-000-000
On May 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017
On May 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Education
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 25, 2017
- Arrive in Senate
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-001
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 019-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; by Voice Vote
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (4)
May 25, 2017: HB3368 - Third Reading
May 16, 2017: HB3368 - Education
April 5, 2017: HB3368 - Third Reading
March 29, 2017: HB3368 - Elem Sec Ed: School Curric Policies
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor