+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (34)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On July 1, 2008 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Rules
On May 22, 2008 in the Senate:
- Held in Education
On May 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2008; Substantive House Bills Out of Committee
- Postponed - Education
On May 1, 2008 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Education
On April 17, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Education
On May 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Referred to Rules
On May 3, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 114-001-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
- Removed from Short Debate Status
On May 2, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote
On April 30, 2007 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
On April 27, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 3, 2007
On April 26, 2007 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jerry L. Mitchell
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 021-000-000
On April 25, 2007 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
On April 24, 2007 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jerry L. Mitchell
On April 19, 2007 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jerry L. Mitchell
On March 14, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 013-000-000
On March 1, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 26, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Cross
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Floor Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Charter Schools Law of the School Code. Under specified circumstances, allows for a maximum of 5 additional charter schools exclusively for truants or dropouts in Chicago if the limit on the number of charter schools that may operate at any one time in the rest of the State has not been reached.
House Floor Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Charter Schools Law of the School Code. Under specified circumstances, allows for a maximum of 5 additional charter schools exclusively for truants or dropouts in Chicago if the limit on the number of charter schools that may operate at any one time in the rest of the State has not been reached.
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
May 3, 2007: HB3361 - Third Reading - Thursday, May 03, 2007
+ − Sponsors (53)
Type:
Primary Sponsor