+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On July 23, 2015 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0116
- Effective Date January 1, 2016
- Governor Approved
On June 17, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 19, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 19, 2015
- Second Reading
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2015
- Do Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 007-000-000
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 21, 2015
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Amusement Ride and Attraction Safety Act. Provides that "amusement ride" includes any dry slide, alpine slide, or toboggan slide.
+ − Statute Amended
- 430 ILCS 85/2-2 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 4052