+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 27, 2021 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor