+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 27, 2021 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee
On March 19, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
On January 29, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 225 ILCS 60/11 - from Ch. 111, par. 4400-11
- 225 ILCS 60/20.1 new
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor