+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (75)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0327
- Governor Approved
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0327
- Effective Date August 13, 2013
- Sent to the Governor
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Environment; 013-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Environment
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Environment
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Environment; 013-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Environment
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Environment; 013-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 118-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 House Concurs 118-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 House Concurs 118-000-000
- House Concurs
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 4 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Held on Second Reading May 30, 2013
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Adopted; Lightford
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Michael W. Tryon
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2, 3, 5
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Michael W. Tryon
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Michael W. Tryon
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2013
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2013
- Second Reading
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 23, 2013
- Do Pass as Amended State Government and Veterans Affairs; 010-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to State Government and Veterans Affairs
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
- Postponed - State Government and Veterans Affairs
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - State Government and Veterans Affairs
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Postponed - State Government and Veterans Affairs
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to State Government and Veterans Affairs
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government and Veterans Affairs
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2013
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
- Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 23, 2013
- Arrive in Senate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 088-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Environment; 017-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Environment; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Environment
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael W. Tryon
- Assigned to Environment
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael W. Tryon
+ − Adopted Amendments (6)
House Amendment 001
Provides that if the coverage of an active drycleaning facility owner or operator under the insurance account ceases for a reason other than the submittal of a claim on that account or the existence of an emergency or emergency action, then the active drycleaning facility owner or operator may re-enroll in the program of coverage provided through the account only by paying the full annual premium calculated using the same risk basis as on the date that the owner or operator was last covered under the account, plus a 20% late fee.
Senate Amendment 002
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Drycleaner Environmental Response Trust Fund Act. Provides that if an insurer sends a second notice to an owner or operator demanding immediate payment of a past-due premium for insurance services provided pursuant to the Act, the demand for payment must offer a grace period of not less than 30 days during which the owner or operator shall be allowed to pay any premiums due. Provides that if payment is made during that period, coverage under the Act shall not be terminated for non-payment by the insurer. Provides that if an insurer terminates an owner or operator's coverage under the Act, the insurer must send a written notice to the owner or operator to inform him or her of the termination of that coverage, and that notice must include instructions on how to seek reinstatement of coverage, as well as information concerning any premiums or penalties that might be due. Effective immediately.
Senate Amendment 003
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Drycleaner Environmental Response Trust Fund Act. Establishes the Drycleaner Environmental Response Trust Fund Task Force. Directs the Task Force to study the resource challenges and implementation issues that the Fund faces and make recommendations for adequately funding the Fund and for refining and improving the goals and implementation of the Trust Fund program. Provides that the new provisions are repealed on January 1, 2016. Makes legislative findings.
Senate Amendment 005
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Drycleaner Environmental Response Trust Fund Act. Establishes the Drycleaner Environmental Response Trust Fund Task Force. Directs the Task Force to study the resource challenges and implementation issues that the Fund faces and to make recommendations for adequately funding the Fund and for refining and improving the goals and implementation of the Trust Fund program. Provides that if an insurer sends a second notice to an owner or operator demanding immediate payment of a past-due premium for insurance services provided pursuant to the Act, the demand for payment must offer a grace period of not less than 30 days during which the owner or operator shall be allowed to pay any premiums due. Provides that if payment is made during that period, coverage under the Act shall not be terminated for non-payment by the insurer. Provides that if an insurer terminates an owner or operator's coverage under the Act, the insurer must send a written notice to the owner or operator to inform him or her of the termination of that coverage, and that notice must include instructions on how to seek reinstatement of coverage, as well as information concerning any premiums or penalties that might be due. Provides that the provisions creating the Task Force are repealed on January 1, 2016. Makes legislative findings. Effective immediately.