+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On July 19, 2019 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0110
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date July 19, 2019
On June 14, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 17, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 048-001-000
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2019
- Second Reading
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2019
- Do Pass Human Services; 008-000-000
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Human Services
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Human Services
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
- First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
- Referred to Assignments
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 075-018-000
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 018-000-000
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (4)
May 17, 2019: HB3343 - Third Reading
May 7, 2019: HB3343 - Human Services
March 29, 2019: HB3343 - Third Reading
March 13, 2019: HB3343 - Human Services
+ − Sponsors (62)
Type:
Primary Sponsor