+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 15, 2011 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
On April 14, 2011 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 30, 2011 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Cities & Villages Committee
On March 29, 2011 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elaine Nekritz
On March 16, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
On March 15, 2011 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 006-004-000
On March 14, 2011 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elaine Nekritz
On March 2, 2011 in the House:
- Re-assigned to Cities & Villages Committee
On February 28, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elaine Nekritz
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 5 ILCS 315/14 - from Ch. 48, par. 1614
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor