+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kambium Buckner
- State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
- Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 014-007-000
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Insurance Committee
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kambium Buckner
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -
+ − Vote
March 26, 2019: HB3323 - Insurance
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor